Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul von Jägerndorf (Harrach)

Deceased

Bishop of Freising


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Oct 1351AppointedBishop of Gurk, Austria
15 May 1359AppointedBishop of Freising, Germany
31 Jul 1377DiedBishop of Freising, Germany

MicroData Summary for Paul von Jägerndorf (Harrach):
Bishop Paul von Jägerndorf (Harrach) (died ) Bishop of Freising

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 255, and Page 270

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 21 Jan 2016