Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephan von Seiboldsdorf

Deceased

Bishop of Freising


Events

DateEventTitle
7 May 1612SelectedBishop of Freising, Germany
4 Mar 1613ConfirmedBishop of Freising, Germany
19 May 1613Ordained BishopBishop of Freising, Germany
18 Jan 1618DiedBishop of Freising, Germany

MicroData Summary for Stephan von Seiboldsdorf:
Bishop Stephan von Seiboldsdorf (died ) Bishop of Freising

  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 190
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1613, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Feb 2015