Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernest Johann Nepomuk von Herberstein (Herbstein)

Deceased

Bishop of Linz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1731³BornWien
22 Apr 175322.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Freising, Germany
3 Mar 175422.8Ordained PriestPriest of Freising, Germany
16 Feb 176735.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany
16 Feb 176735.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Eucarpia
8 Mar 176735.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eucarpia
1 Jan 178553.6SelectedBishop of Linz, Austria
10 Jan 178553.7ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany
14 Feb 178553.8ConfirmedBishop of Linz, Austria
1 May 178554.0InstalledBishop of Linz, Austria
17 Mar 178856.9DiedBishop of Linz, Austria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ernest Johann Nepomuk von Herberstein (Herbstein):
Bishop Ernest Johann Nepomuk von Herberstein (Herbstein) (born , died ) Bishop of Linz

  • a priest for 34.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,652
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 210, and Page 263
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 452
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 19 Dec 2015