Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernhard Hasslberger (Haßlberger)

Auxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}

Titular Bishop of Octaba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1946 BornRuhpolding
25 Jun 197730.6Ordained PriestPriest of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
31 May 199447.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
31 May 199447.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Octaba
29 Jun 199447.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Octaba

MicroData Summary for Bernhard Hasslberger (Haßlberger):
Bishop Bernhard Hasslberger (Haßlberger) (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of München und Freising {Munich}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,348

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015