Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Baptist Neuhäusler

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Calydon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1888Born
29 Jun 191325.4Ordained PriestPriest of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
8 Feb 194759.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
8 Feb 194759.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Calydon
20 Apr 194759.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Calydon
14 Dec 197385.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Baptist Neuhäusler (VIAF: 263922381)
Bishop Johannes Baptist Neuhäusler (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEisenhofen

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast