Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valentin Anton von Schneid

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

Titular Bishop of Corycus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1734BornMainz
9 Jun 175924.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Freising, Germany
22 Sep 175924.7Ordained PriestPriest of Freising, Germany
13 Dec 177945.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
13 Dec 177945.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Corycus
23 Jan 178045.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corycus
30 Oct 180267.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Valentin Anton von Schneid:
Bishop Valentin Anton von Schneid (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 165
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 4
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 185, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015