Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Konrad Cardinal von Preysing Lichtenegg-Moos

Deceased

Bishop of Berlin

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1880BornKronwinkel
26 Jul 191231.9Ordained PriestPriest of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
9 Sep 193252.0AppointedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
28 Oct 193252.2Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
5 Jul 193554.8AppointedBishop of Berlin, Germany
31 Aug 193555.0InstalledBishop of Berlin, Germany
15 Oct 193555.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
15 Mar 193756.5ResignedApostolic Administrator of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
18 Feb 194665.5Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 194665.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
21 Dec 195070.3DiedBishop of Berlin, Germany

MicroData Summary for Konrad von Preysing Lichtenegg-Moos:
Cardinal Konrad von Preysing Lichtenegg-Moos (born , died ) Bishop of Berlin

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
  • a cardinal for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013