Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bonifaz Kaspar von Urban

Deceased

Archbishop of Bamberg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1773BornOberherrnhausen
179219.0ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
31 May 179522.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of St. Augustine
26 Mar 179623.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
180330.0IncardinatedPriest of Freising, Germany
19 Dec 183462.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
19 Dec 183462.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Taenarum
22 Mar 183562.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Taenarum
24 Feb 184269.1SelectedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
23 May 184269.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
24 Jul 184269.5InstalledArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
9 Jan 185885.0DiedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Bonifaz Kaspar von Urban:
Archbishop Bonifaz Kaspar von Urban (born , died ) Archbishop of Bamberg

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 104, and Page 357

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013