Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Herwig Gössl

Auxiliary Bishop of Bamberg

Titular Bishop of Balecium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1967 Born München
26 Jun 199326.3Ordained PriestPriest of Bamberg, Germany
24 Jan 201446.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
24 Jan 201446.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Balecium
15 Mar 201447.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Balecium

MicroData Summary for Herwig Gössl:
Bishop Herwig Gössl (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bamberg

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Bamberg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 28 Jan 2014
  • c34: CB, 11 Mar 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 13 Mar 2014