Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Engelbert Siebler

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Tela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1937Born
29 Jun 196326.0Ordained PriestPriest of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
27 Feb 198648.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
27 Feb 198648.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tela
20 Apr 198648.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tela
31 Jul 201275.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
11 Oct 201881.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Engelbert Siebler (VIAF: 255318995)
Bishop Engelbert Siebler (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of München und Freising {Munich}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMünchen

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Jul 2012
  • d: CB, 12 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 9 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Oct 2018

Quantcast