Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Max Polykarp von Törring-Jettenbach

Deceased

Bishop of Regensburg, Germany

Bishop of Freising


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1739³Born
3 Oct 176222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Freising, Germany
20 Apr 178747.4SelectedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
28 Sep 178747.9ConfirmedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
28 Oct 178748.0Ordained BishopBishop of Regensburg, Germany
26 May 178848.5SelectedBishop of Freising, Germany
15 Sep 178848.8ConfirmedBishop of Freising, Germany
30 Dec 178950.1DiedBishop of Regensburg, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Max Polykarp von Törring-Jettenbach (VIAF: 37779240)
Bishop Max Polykarp von Törring-Jettenbach (born , died ) Bishop of Regensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMünchen, Diocese of Freising
Ordained BishopStiftskirche Sankt Jakob und Sankt Tiburtius, Basilica, Straubing, Diocese of Freising

  • a priest for 27.2 years
  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1787, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 219, and Page 352
  • c34: CB, 9 Jan 2017
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,306
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Number 3,541

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 26 Jun 2020

Quantcast