Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rupert Ferdinand Carl Thaddäus Antonius Maria Stolberg

Auxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}

Titular Bishop of Sassura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1970 BornSalzburg, Austria
28 Jun 200332.9Ordained PriestPriest of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
28 Oct 201646.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
28 Oct 201646.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sassura
10 Dec 201646.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sassura

MicroData Summary for Rupert Ferdinand Carl Thaddäus Antonius Maria Stolberg
Bishop Rupert Ferdinand Carl Thaddäus Antonius Maria Stolberg (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of München und Freising {Munich}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Oct 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 28 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 10 Dec 2016