Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Dominic Laurence Graessl, S.J. †

Deceased

Priest of Society of Jesus

Titular See: (appointment occurred after his death)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1753Born
Oct 179340.1DiedPriest of Society of Jesus
8 Dec 179340.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
8 Dec 179340.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Samosata

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Dominic Laurence Graessl:
Priest Dominic Laurence Graessl S.J. (born ) Priest of Society of Jesus

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013