Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Ferdinand Joseph von Boedigkeim

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Freising

Titular Bishop of Amyclae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1685³BornSulzemoos
21 Dec 171227.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Freising, Germany
25 Dec 171227.1Ordained PriestPriest of Freising, Germany
22 Nov 173045.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany
22 Nov 173045.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyclae
31 Dec 173045.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amyclae
28 Apr 175670.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Ferdinand Joseph von Boedigkeim:
Bishop Johann Ferdinand Joseph von Boedigkeim (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Freising

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 80, and Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 6 Oct 2013