Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Julius August Cardinal Döpfner

Deceased

Archbishop of München und Freising {Munich}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Scala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1913BornHausen
29 Oct 193926.1Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
11 Aug 194834.9AppointedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
14 Oct 194835.1Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
15 Jan 195743.3AppointedBishop of Berlin, Germany
25 Mar 195743.5InstalledBishop of Berlin, Germany
15 Dec 195845.3Elevated to Cardinal
15 Dec 195845.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Scala
3 Jul 196147.8AppointedArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
30 Sep 196148.0InstalledArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
24 Jul 197662.9DiedArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Julius August Döpfner:
Julius August Cardinal Döpfner (born , died ) Archbishop of München und Freising {Munich}

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.7 years
  • a cardinal for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 110

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015