Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Kaspar Kühner

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Freising

Titular Bishop of Centuria


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Dec 1664AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany
15 Dec 1664AppointedTitular Bishop of Centuria
19 Apr 1665Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Centuria
28 Jul 1685DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Kaspar Kühner:
Bishop Johann Kaspar Kühner (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Freising

  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 145

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013