Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albrecht von Hohenberg

Deceased

Bishop of Freising, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Oct 1345AppointedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
7 Oct 1349AppointedBishop of Freising, Germany
25 Apr 1359DiedBishop of Freising, Germany

MicroData Summary for Albrecht von Hohenberg
Bishop Albrecht von Hohenberg (died ) Bishop of Freising

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 273, and Page 255
  • b: Germania Sacra: Neue Folge, Volume 4, Page 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast