Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anton von Thoma

Deceased

Archbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1829Born
29 Jun 185324.3Ordained PriestPriest of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
24 Mar 188960.0SelectedBishop of Passau, Germany
27 May 188960.2ConfirmedBishop of Passau, Germany
28 Jul 188960.4Ordained BishopBishop of Passau, Germany
23 Oct 188960.6SelectedArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
30 Dec 188960.8ConfirmedArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
21 Apr 189061.1InstalledArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
24 Nov 189768.7DiedArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Anton von Thoma (VIAF: 5706609)
Archbishop Anton von Thoma (born , died ) Archbishop of München und Freising {Munich}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNymphenburg
Ordained BishopCathedral, Passau, Diocese of Passau

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 390, and Page 442
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017