Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Fiernhammer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany

Titular Bishop of Dariensis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1586Born
2 Apr 161124.3Ordained PriestPriest of Freising, Germany
30 Jan 164053.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany
30 Jan 164053.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Dariensis
19 Feb 166376.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Fiernhammer
Bishop Johann Fiernhammer (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Freising

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFreising

  • a priest for 51.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 173
  • ab: CB, 31 Oct 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1640, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast