Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Konrad von Tölz und Hohenburg

Deceased

Bishop of Freising, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Oct 1230AppointedBishop of Freising, Germany
30 May 1232Ordained BishopBishop of Freising, Germany
18 Jan 1258DiedBishop of Freising, Germany

MicroData Summary for Konrad von Tölz und Hohenburg (VIAF: 80991513)
Bishop Konrad von Tölz und Hohenburg (died ) Bishop of Freising

EventPlace
Ordained BishopKärnten, Friesach

  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 255
  • b/c2+: ATh, 12 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 13 Oct 2017