Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Ignaz Albert von Werdenstein

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany

Titular Bishop of Taenarum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1697Born
21 Dec 172023.2Ordained PriestPriest of Freising, Germany
20 Sep 175658.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany
20 Sep 175658.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Taenarum
21 Nov 175659.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Taenarum
9 Sep 176668.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Ignaz Albert von Werdenstein
Bishop Franz Ignaz Albert von Werdenstein (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Freising

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDellmansingen

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1756, Number 27
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 390, and Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast