Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Franz von Eckher von Kapfing und Liechteneck

Deceased

Bishop of Freising, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1649Born
167424.2Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jan 169545.2SelectedBishop of Freising, Germany
2 Apr 169646.4ConfirmedBishop of Freising, Germany
1 Jul 169646.7Ordained BishopBishop of Freising, Germany
23 Feb 172777.3DiedBishop of Freising, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Franz von Eckher von Kapfing und Liechteneck
Bishop Johann Franz von Eckher von Kapfing und Liechteneck (born , died ) Bishop of Freising

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrain
Ordained BishopFreising, Diocese of Freising

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 205
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 21
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Number 3,486

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast