Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Baptist Schauer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Sabadia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1872Born
28 Oct 189725.3Ordained PriestPriest of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
13 Jul 192856.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
13 Jul 192856.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sabadia
9 Sep 192856.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sabadia
15 Sep 194270.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Baptist Schauer
Bishop Johann Baptist Schauer (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLindach

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast