Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rudolf Voderholzer

Bishop of Regensburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1959 BornMünchen
17 Jun 198727.7Ordained PriestPriest of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
6 Dec 201253.2AppointedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
26 Jan 201353.3Ordained BishopBishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Rudolf Voderholzer:
Bishop Rudolf Voderholzer (born ) Bishop of Regensburg

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Regensburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Dec 2012
  • ob: CB, 10 Dec 2012
  • c2+: CB, 12 Dec 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,649

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013