Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Sigmund Zeller von und zu Leibersdorf

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany

Titular Bishop of Belline


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1653Born
4 Apr 167623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
6 Oct 169239.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany
6 Oct 169239.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Belline
2 Nov 169239.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Belline
30 Dec 172976.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Sigmund Zeller von und zu Leibersdorf
Bishop Johann Sigmund Zeller von und zu Leibersdorf (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Freising

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAichach

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 116, and Page 205
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast