Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Cardinal Halgrin, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1180¹BornAbbeville
Mar 1225³45.2AppointedArchbishop of Besanšon, France
19 Oct 122545.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Besanšon, France
1226²46.0ResignedArchbishop of Besanšon, France
23 Dec 122647.0AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
18 Sep 122747.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
18 Sep 122747.7Elevated to Cardinal
28 Sep 123757.7DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Jean Halgrin:
Cardinal Jean Halgrin O.S.B. (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

  • a bishop for 11.9 years
  • a cardinal for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 137
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,072
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Sep 1227

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 4 Jan 2014