Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emile-Charles-Raymond Pirolley

Deceased

Bishop of Nancy (-Toul), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1898Born
29 Jun 192526.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 195152.2AppointedBishop of Mende, France
16 Jun 195152.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mende, France
26 Jan 195758.1AppointedBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
29 Jun 197172.5DiedBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France

MicroData Summary for Emile-Charles-Raymond Pirolley
Bishop Emile-Charles-Raymond Pirolley (born , died ) Bishop of Nancy (-Toul)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBesançon

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast