Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Philippe Gabriel Marie Augustin Ballot

Archbishop of Chambéry (-Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne-Tarentaise), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1956 Born
29 Jun 198528.7Ordained PriestPriest of Besançon, France
14 Jan 200952.2AppointedArchbishop of Chambéry (-Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne-Tarentaise), France
26 Apr 200952.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Chambéry (-Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne-Tarentaise), France

MicroData Summary for Philippe Gabriel Marie Augustin Ballot
Archbishop Philippe Gabriel Marie Augustin Ballot (born ) Archbishop of Chambéry (-Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne-Tarentaise)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVesoul

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Chambéry (-Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne-Tarentaise).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,163

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast