Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Cuminal

Deceased

Bishop of Blois


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1923BornAmiens
29 Jun 194623.2Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jan 197551.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Besançon, France
2 Jan 197551.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Curubis
8 Mar 197551.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Curubis
6 May 198259.1AppointedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
25 Jul 199067.3AppointedBishop of Blois, France
18 Apr 199673.0DiedBishop of Blois, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Cuminal:
Bishop Jean Cuminal (born , died ) Bishop of Blois

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 10 Mar 2014