Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre François Hugon

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Besançon

Titular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1675³BornGray
11 Apr 173660.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Besançon, France
11 Apr 173660.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
24 Jun 173660.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
17 Sep 175478.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Besançon, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre François Hugon:
Bishop Pierre François Hugon (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Besançon

  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 336, and Page 452
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1736, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 4 Jan 2016