Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franšois Gaspard de Grammont

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Besanšon

Titular Bishop of Arethusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1656¹Born
1 Aug 170751.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Besanšon, France
1 Aug 170751.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Arethusa
11 Dec 170751.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arethusa
17 Nov 172771.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Besanšon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franšois Gaspard de Grammont:
Bishop Franšois Gaspard de Grammont (born 1656, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Besanšon

  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1707
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1707, Number 31
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 97

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 6 Jul 2015