Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Jacques Bussini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Amiens, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1936Born
5 Jul 196529.1Ordained PriestPriest of Besançon, France
12 Dec 197741.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Grenoble, France
12 Dec 197741.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Febiana
4 Mar 197841.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Febiana
28 Dec 198549.6AppointedBishop of Amiens, France
6 Mar 198750.7ResignedBishop of Amiens, France
13 Oct 201882.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Amiens, France

MicroData Summary for François Jacques Bussini
Bishop François Jacques Bussini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Amiens

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSallanches
Death PlaceBesançon, Archdiocese of Besançon

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 40.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 16 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 17 Oct 2018

Quantcast