Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel Marie Joseph Maître, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bambari, Central African Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1928Born
5 Jul 195325.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
4 Oct 195325.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
19 Jun 198153.2AppointedBishop of Bambari, Central African Republic
27 Sep 198153.4Ordained BishopBishop of Bambari, Central African Republic
29 Feb 199667.9DiedBishop of Bambari, Central African Republic

MicroData Summary for Michel Marie Joseph Maître
Bishop Michel Marie Joseph Maître C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop of Bambari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColombier-Fontaine, Archdiocese of Besançon, France
Ordained DeaconSeminary of the Missions, Chapel, Chevilly-Larue, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestSeminary of the Missions, Chapel, Chevilly-Larue, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopIn front of, Cathedral, Bambari, Diocese of Bambari
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 8 Jul 2018

Quantcast