Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre Cardinal de La Baume

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Besançon, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1477¹Born
10 Oct 152245.7AppointedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
16 Oct 1522³45.7Ordained BishopBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
13 Jul 153053.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Besançon, France
19 Dec 153962.9Elevated to Cardinal
21 Nov 154164.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
29 Dec 154164.9SucceededArchbishop of Besançon, France
27 Jun 154366.4ResignedArchbishop of Besançon, France
6 Jul 154366.5ResignedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
4 May 154467.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Besançon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Pierre de La Baume (VIAF: 18370402)
Pierre Cardinal de La Baume (born 1477, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Besançon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontrevel
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceArbois
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Just, Church, Arbois

  • a bishop for 21.5 years
  • a cardinal for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1539
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 134, and Page 201
  • ob/c2+: CB, 6 Aug 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018