Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gabriel Cortois de Pressigny

Deceased

Archbishop of Besançon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1745BornDijon
6 Nov 178539.9SelectedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
19 Dec 178540.0ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
15 Jan 178640.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Malo, France
13 Feb 178640.2InstalledBishop of Saint-Malo, France
19 Sep 180155.8ResignedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
9 Sep 181771.7SelectedArchbishop of Besançon, France
1 Oct 181771.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Besançon, France
2 May 182377.4DiedArchbishop of Besançon, France

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Cortois de Pressigny:
Archbishop Gabriel Cortois de Pressigny (born , died ) Archbishop of Besançon

  • a bishop for 37.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 112

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013