Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Paul Barnabé Perrot, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San, Mali


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1921Born
1 Feb 194928.0Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
10 Apr 196241.2AppointedSuperior of San, Mali
28 Jun 196241.4AppointedPrefect of San, Mali
29 Sep 196443.6AppointedBishop of San, Mali
9 Jan 196543.9Ordained BishopBishop of San, Mali
18 Nov 198766.8ResignedBishop of San, Mali
22 Jun 200584.4DiedBishop Emeritus of San, Mali

MicroData Summary for Joseph Paul Barnabé Perrot
Bishop Joseph Paul Barnabé Perrot M. Afr. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrand-Combe-des-Bois, France

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Jun 2017