Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Richardot, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Arras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1507²Born Morey-Ville-Église
12 Nov 155447.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Besançon, France
12 Nov 155447.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicopolis ad Iaterum
10 Mar 156154.2AppointedBishop of Arras, France
26 Jul 157467.6DiedBishop of Arras, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François Richardot:
Bishop François Richardot O.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Arras

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 24 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014