Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François Busleiden

Deceased

Archbishop of Besançon, France

Administrator of Coria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1450²Born
12 Oct 149848.7SelectedArchbishop of Besançon, France
14 Mar 149949.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Besançon, France
26 Nov 150151.9AppointedAdministrator of Coria, Spain
23 Aug 150252.6DiedArchbishop of Besançon, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François Busleiden (VIAF: 100577675)
Archbishop François Busleiden (born 1450, died ) Archbishop of Besançon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBauschleiden
Death PlaceToledo, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain
Buried Place (Original)Bernardine, Monastery, near Toledo, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 106, and Page 123
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,499, Number 11*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast