Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Doroz (Dorotheus), O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lausanne, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1537¹Born
20 Aug 158548.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Besanšon, France
20 Aug 158548.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicopolis in Palaestina
13 Aug 160063.6AppointedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
26 Aug 160770.6DiedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Doroz (Dorotheus)
Bishop Jean Doroz (Dorotheus) O. Cist. (born 1537, died ) Bishop of Lausanne

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoligny, Jura
Death PlaceChaux-les-Clerval

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 220, and Page 258
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,585, Number 19*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast