Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Condulmer

Deceased

Bishop of Verona, Italy

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1410Born
19 Sep 143121.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
19 Sep 143121.7Elevated to Cardinal
143323.0AppointedAdministrator of Narbonne, France
5 Nov 143626.8AppointedAdministrator of Amiens, France
27 Mar 143727.2AppointedArchbishop of Besanšon, France
20 Oct 143828.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Verona, Italy
31 Oct 143828.8AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
Apr 144535.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
30 Oct 145343.8DiedBishop of Verona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Condulmer
Francesco Cardinal Condulmer (born 1410, died ) Bishop of Verona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Diocese of Castello

  • a cardinal for 22.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Sep 1431
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast