Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Claude Cardinal de La Baume

Deceased

Archbishop of Besançon, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1534¹Born
27 Jun 15439.4AppointedArchbishop of Besançon, France
10 Aug 156632.6Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jun 157036.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Besançon, France
21 Feb 157844.1Elevated to Cardinal
24 Aug 158046.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
14 Jun 158450.4DiedArchbishop of Besançon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude de La Baume (VIAF: 281348418)
Claude Cardinal de La Baume (born 1534, died ) Archbishop of Besançon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFranche-Conté
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceArbois
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Just, Church, Arbois

  • a priest for 17.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
  • a cardinal for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Feb 1578
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 134
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 16, Number 60
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1570, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast