Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raymond de Durfort

Deceased

Archbishop of Besançon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1725BornRoque-en-Quercy
10 Jun 176438.8SelectedBishop of Avranches, France
20 Aug 176439.0ConfirmedBishop of Avranches, France
8 Sep 176439.0Ordained BishopBishop of Avranches, France
25 May 176640.7SelectedBishop of Montpellier, France
4 Aug 176640.9ResignedBishop of Avranches, France
6 Aug 176640.9ConfirmedBishop of Montpellier, France
16 Jan 177448.4SelectedArchbishop of Besançon, France
14 Apr 177448.6ResignedBishop of Montpellier, France
9 May 177448.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Besançon, France
19 Mar 179266.6DiedArchbishop of Besançon, France

MicroData Summary for Raymond de Durfort:
Archbishop Raymond de Durfort (born , died ) Archbishop of Besançon

  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 61, and Page 123
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 296
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 1 Jan 2016