Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ferdinand de Rye

Deceased

Archbishop of Besançon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1550Born
5 Nov 158636.0AppointedArchbishop of Besançon, France
16 Aug 158736.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Besançon, France
20 Aug 163685.8DiedArchbishop of Besançon, France

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand de Rye (VIAF: 304914137)
Archbishop Ferdinand de Rye (born , died ) Archbishop of Besançon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChateau, Balancon
Ordained BishopXII Apôtres, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 49.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 134
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 26, Number 120
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1587, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast