Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre Cardot, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southern Burma {Birmania Meridionale}

Titular Bishop of Limyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1857BornFresse, France
20 Sep 187922.7Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
21 Mar 189336.2AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Southern Burma {Birmania Meridionale}, Myanmar
21 Mar 189336.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Limyra
24 Jun 189336.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Limyra
19 Mar 189437.2SucceededVicar Apostolic of Southern Burma {Birmania Meridionale}, Myanmar
18 Oct 192568.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Southern Burma {Birmania Meridionale}, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Alexandre Cardot:
Bishop Alexandre Cardot M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southern Burma {Birmania Meridionale}

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 344

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013