Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurice-Jean-Fernand-Alexis Pourchet

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Flour, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1906Born
20 Dec 193024.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Besançon, France
29 Jun 193124.6Ordained PriestPriest of Besançon, France
28 Mar 196053.4AppointedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
31 May 196053.5Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Flour, France
6 May 198275.5RetiredBishop of Saint-Flour, France
2 Jan 200497.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Flour, France

MicroData Summary for Maurice-Jean-Fernand-Alexis Pourchet (VIAF: 227719974)
Bishop Maurice-Jean-Fernand-Alexis Pourchet (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Flour

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMorteau, Archdiocese of Besançon
Ordained DeaconSeminary Saint-Sulpice, Chapel, Issy-les-Moulineaux, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestSaint-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopSaint-Jean-Baptiste, Cathedral, Besançon, Archdiocese of Besançon
Death PlaceBesançon, Archdiocese of Besançon

  • a priest for 72.5 years
  • a bishop for 43.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 63
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 17 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jul 2018

Quantcast