Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop André Jean René Lacrampe, Ist. del Prado †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Besançon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1941BornAgos-Vidalos
31 Dec 196726.0Ordained PriestPriest of Istituto del Prado
13 Jul 198341.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Reims, France
13 Jul 198341.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Legia
16 Oct 198341.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Legia
1 Oct 198846.7AppointedPrelate of Mission de France o Pontigny, France
5 Jan 199553.0AppointedBishop of Ajaccio, France
13 Aug 200361.6AppointedArchbishop of Besançon, France
25 Apr 201371.3ResignedArchbishop of Besançon, France
15 May 201573.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Besançon, France

MicroData Summary for André Jean René Lacrampe:
Archbishop André Jean René Lacrampe Ist. del Prado (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Besançon

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Apr 2013
  • d: CB, 16 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 18 May 2015