Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Thomas-Marie-Joseph Cardinal Gousset

Deceased

Archbishop of Reims

Cardinal-Priest of San Callisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1792BornMontigny-les-Cherlieux
22 Jul 181725.2Ordained PriestPriest of Besançon, France
30 Oct 183543.5SelectedBishop of Périgueux, France
1 Feb 183643.8ConfirmedBishop of Périgueux, France
6 Mar 183643.8Ordained BishopBishop of Périgueux, France
18 Mar 183643.9InstalledBishop of Périgueux, France
4 Jun 184048.1SelectedArchbishop of Reims, France
13 Jul 184048.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Reims, France
30 Sep 185058.4Elevated to Cardinal
10 Apr 185158.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
22 Dec 186674.6DiedArchbishop of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for Thomas-Marie-Joseph Gousset:
Cardinal Thomas-Marie-Joseph Gousset (born , died ) Archbishop of Reims

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
  • a cardinal for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 47
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 303, and Page 322

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013