Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoine de Vergy (Verzy)

Deceased

Archbishop of Besançon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1487¹Born
4 Nov 150215.8AppointedArchbishop of Besançon, France
31 May 151730.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Besançon, France
29 Dec 154154.9DiedArchbishop of Besançon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine de Vergy (Verzy)
Archbishop Antoine de Vergy (Verzy) (born 1487, died ) Archbishop of Besançon

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSaint Jean l`Évangéliste, Cathedral, Besançon, Archdiocese of Besançon

  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 134
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,318
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1517, Number 4
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 106

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 May 2018

Quantcast