Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-François-Marie Cart

Deceased

Bishop of Nîmes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1799³BornMouthe
21 Sep 182223.1Ordained PriestPriest of Besançon, France
22 Dec 183738.3SelectedBishop of Nîmes, France
12 Feb 183838.4ConfirmedBishop of Nîmes, France
22 Apr 183838.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nîmes, France
13 Aug 185556.0DiedBishop of Nîmes, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-François-Marie Cart:
Bishop Jean-François-Marie Cart (born , died ) Bishop of Nîmes

  • a priest for 32.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 279

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013