Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude-François-Ignace Franchet de Rans

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Besançon

Titular Bishop of Rhosus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1722BornBesançon
5 Apr 175634.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Besançon, France
5 Apr 175634.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhosus
23 May 175634.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhosus
21 Feb 181088.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Besançon, France

MicroData Summary for Claude-François-Ignace Franchet de Rans:
Bishop Claude-François-Ignace Franchet de Rans (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Besançon

  • a bishop for 53.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 357, and Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015